CT HB06956 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a panel to assess the viability of establishing a sustainable community rating system in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning A Sustainable Community Rating System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-06 | House | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-06 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-04-08 | House | File Number 530 |
2015-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 337 |
2015-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |