CT HB06949 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require that statements from the parents or guardian of a child seeking a religious exemption from a required immunization be notarized and include language attesting that such parents or guardian have reviewed and understand information regarding the risks of both immunization and failure to immunize.
Title
An Act Concerning Childhood Vaccinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 391 PASS (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 390 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 7676 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 73 AS AMENDED (Y: 85 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 390 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 7676 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 73 AS AMENDED (Y: 85 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-15 | House | Public Act 15-174 |
2015-06-02 | House | In Concurrence |
2015-06-02 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-02 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-02 | House | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 7676 |
2015-05-11 | House | File Number 809 |
2015-05-11 | House | Senate Calendar Number 487 |
2015-05-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-07 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 6998 |
2015-05-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6923 |
2015-04-14 | House | File Number 627 |
2015-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 397 |
2015-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |