CT HB06923 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure per diem compensation equity for state board of mediation and arbitration arbitrators.
Title
An Act Concerning Per Diem Equity For State Board Of Mediation And Arbitration Arbitrators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-04 | House | File Number 405 |
2019-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 257 |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-03-18 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |