CT HB06915 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) ensure that borrowers who take on student loans have adequate resources at their disposal, and (2) regulate student loan servicers in Connecticut.
Title
An Act Concerning A Student Loan Bill Of Rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 399 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 19 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 19 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-15 | House | Public Act 15-162 |
2015-06-02 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-06-02 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-02 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-04-16 | House | File Number 721 |
2015-04-16 | House | Senate Calendar Number 382 |
2015-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-04-14 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6170 |
2015-03-26 | House | File Number 237 |
2015-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 168 |
2015-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-27 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |