CT HB06910 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) increase grant amounts for gubernatorial candidates, (2) modify the consumer price index adjustments for grant amounts and maximum individual contribution amounts across the Citizens' Election Program, as well as for organization expenditure amounts, (3) authorize adequate funding of the program, (4) provide grants in the event of adjourned primaries and court-ordered new elections or primaries, (5) establish in-state contributor thresholds for the qualifying amounts state-wide candidates are required to raise, (6) provide that certain supplemental campaign finance statements shall satisfy certain filing requirements, and (7) specify that individual contributions under the program may not exceed already-established contribution limits.
Title
An Act Restoring The Citizens' Election Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-04-17 | House | File Number 628 |
2023-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 413 |
2023-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |