CT HB06867 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - File Number 375
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - File Number 375
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require insurers, health care centers, managed care organizations or other entities and preferred provider networks to maintain adequate health care provider networks and the Insurance Commissioner, in consultation with the Healthcare Advocate, to assess such network adequacy.
Title
An Act Concerning Health Care Provider Network Adequacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | File Number 375 |
2015-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 231 |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-27 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |