CT HB06835 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - File Number 812
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - File Number 812
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require school districts to provide a program of bilingual education when there are six or more eligible students enrolled in a public school; to increase the time a student may spend in a program of bilingual education from thirty months to sixty months; to expand the measures used to evaluate the effectiveness of bilingual education and English as a second language programs; to provide school districts flexibility in who may provide instruction as part of the bilingual education requirement; and to require the Department of Education to study the feasibility of regional educational service centers providing assistance to school districts for the provision of bilingual education programs.
Title
An Act Concerning English Language Learners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | File Number 812 |
2015-05-12 | House | House Calendar Number 543 |
2015-05-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/11/15 5:00 PM |
2015-04-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |