CT HB06828 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To streamline the permitting process for a film project by making the Department of Economic and Community Development's Office of Television and Digital Media the single state-wide point of contact.
Title
An Act Authorizing Bonds Of The State For Economic Development Projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |