CT HB06822 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - File Number 472
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - File Number 472
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To amend statutes as recommended by the Department of Motor Vehicles concerning three-wheeled motorcycles and autocycles, motor vehicle inspectors, technical and minor changes to the motor vehicle statutes and the issuance of temporary licenses, and a study of the limited license program.
Title
An Act Concerning Department Of Motor Vehicle's Recommendations Regarding Technical And Minor Changes To The Department Of Motor Vehicle Statutes And The Issuance Of Temporary Licenses, Operation Of Golf Carts And A Study Of The Limited License Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | House | File Number 472 |
2015-04-07 | House | House Calendar Number 301 |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-30 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
Connecticut State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/TOB/H/2015HB-06822-R00-HB.htm |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/TOB/H/2015HB-06822-R01-HB.htm |