CT HB06769 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - File Number 174
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - File Number 174
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that when a private occupational school fails to close in accordance with statutory requirements, any letter of credit issued to such school may be made payable to the private occupational school protection account and the executive director of the Office of Higher Education may confer, after such school closes, a credential of completion to students who have met the requirements of their program.
Title
An Act Concerning The Unexpected Closure Of Private Occupational Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | File Number 174 |
2015-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 120 |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-20 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |