CT HB06756 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Housing to establish a pilot program to provide temporary housing to homeless persons suffering from illness or injury.
Title
An Act Establishing A Pilot Program To Provide Medical Respite For The Homeless.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-30 | House | File Number 282 |
2015-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 178 |
2015-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |