CT HB06753 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - File Number 118
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - File Number 118
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify certain powers of Connecticut banks.
Title
An Act Concerning Connecticut Banks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | File Number 118 |
2015-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 94 |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-13 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |