CT HB06743 | 2015 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - File Number 899
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To implement the recommendations of the Task Force on Cadmium in Children's Jewelry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Task Force On Cadmium In Children's Jewelry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 210 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-27SenateFile Number 899
2015-05-27SenateSenate Calendar Number 601
2015-05-27SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2015-05-26SenateImmediate Transmittal to the Senate
2015-05-26HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2015-05-26HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7855
2015-04-21HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2015-04-21HouseNo New File by Committee on Judiciary
2015-04-21HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2015-04-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2015-04-20HouseJoint Favorable
2015-04-14HouseReferred by House to Committee on Judiciary
2015-03-31HouseFile Number 318
2015-03-31HouseHouse Calendar Number 200
2015-03-31HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2015-03-31HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2015-03-24HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM
2015-03-16HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2015-03-12HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2015-02-20HousePublic Hearing 02/24
2015-02-06HouseReferred to Joint Committee on General Law

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback