CT HB06740 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - File Number 410
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - File Number 410
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit any existing provider of commuter rail service to bid on, and, if selected, to provide such services on the New Haven-Hartford-Springfield rail line.
Title
An Act Concerning The Process To Select An Operator For The New Haven-hartford-springfield Rail Line.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | File Number 410 |
2015-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 268 |
2015-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-06 | House | Public Hearing 02/11 |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |