CT HB06681 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require persons representing property owners or lessors in certain appeals concerning real property assessments to be either attorneys or certified or provisionally licensed real estate appraisers and to prohibit contingency fee agreements in such appeals.
Title
An Act Concerning Municipal Tax Appeals And Contingency Agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | No Action |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-11 | House | File Number 498 |
2017-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 339 |
2017-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2017-03-22 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-03 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-09 | House | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2017-02-02 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |