CT HB06662 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - File Number 656
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - File Number 656
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To declare racism as a public health crisis, establish the Commission on Racial Equity in Public Health and require studies concerning the racial equity of various state programs related to such crisis.
Title
An Act Declaring Racism As A Public Health Crisis And Establishing The Commission On Racial Equity In Public Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | File Number 656 |
2021-05-10 | House | House Calendar Number 475 |
2021-05-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |