CT HB06633 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-15 - File Number 513
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-15 - File Number 513
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To limit the ability of persons who have been convicted of or pled guilty or nolo contendere to certain felonies from serving as campaign treasurers or from receiving a grant from the Citizens' Election Fund.
Title
An Act Concerning Campaign Finance Law And Prior Bad Acts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | File Number 513 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 330 |
2013-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |