CT HB06631 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify that the parties to a gestational agreement may receive a replacement certificate of birth for the child born of the agreement which identifies the intended parent or parents under the gestational agreement as parents of the child.
Title
An Act Concerning The Creation Of A Replacement Birth Certificate Pursuant To A Gestational Agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 484 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 261 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 261 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-24 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-21 | Public Act 11-153 | |
2011-06-07 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-03 | File Number 899 | |
2011-06-03 | Senate Calendar Number 630 | |
2011-06-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-06-02 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2011-06-02 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-02 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8197 | |
2011-05-11 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-11 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |
2011-05-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-11 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-04 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-04-27 | File Number 648 | |
2011-04-27 | House Calendar Number 377 | |
2011-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-13 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-12 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-25 | Public Hearing 03/30 | |
2011-03-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |