CT HB06611 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-25 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the issuance of on-line dog licenses from the Department of Agriculture in addition to the current town clerk process for receiving such licenses.
Title
An Act Concerning On-line Dog Licenses From The Department Of Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-22 | House | File Number 160 |
2023-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 126 |
2023-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-03 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-02-09 | House | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |