CT HB06600 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a pilot program providing a reduction in the tax rate of pass-through entities in the manufacturing, bioscience and allied health fields.
Title
An Act Concerning A Pilot Program For The Taxation Of Pass-through Entities In The Manufacturing, Bioscience, And Allied Health Fields.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2013-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |