CT HB06598 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - File Number 376
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-04 - File Number 376
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow state agencies holding seized firearms to manage their inventory of such firearms without the risk of liability, and to permit peace officers to possess firearms on school grounds, even when off duty.
Title
An Act Concerning The Disposal Of Weapons Seized From A Person Who Poses A Risk Of Imminent Personal Injury To Self Or Others.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | File Number 376 |
2013-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 256 |
2013-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |