CT HB06583 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow volunteer ambulance associations and company members to use blue, rather than green, lights on their vehicles and permit elected constables to use red lights on their vehicles while involved in traffic direction operations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Emergency Lights By A Constable Or A Member Of A Volunteer Ambulance Association Or Company.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-20 | House | No New File by Committee on Transportation |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation |
2023-04-03 | House | File Number 355 |
2023-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 242 |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-02-10 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |