CT HB06566 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 684
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit municipal employees from serving on any governmental body charged with preparing the municipal budget except when authorized by charter or home rule ordinance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Prohibiting Municipal Employees From Serving On Certain Municipal Legislative Bodies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseFile Number 684
2019-04-17HouseHouse Calendar Number 420
2019-04-17HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-01HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/15
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
2019-02-27HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-06HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback