CT HB06551 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To enact the National Association of Insurance Commissioners' requirements for domestic insurers to establish and maintain a risk management framework and to file at least annually an Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Summary Report.
Title
An Act Concerning Own Risk And Solvency Assessments For Domestic Insurers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-17 | House | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-16 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2013-04-02 | House | File Number 305 |
2013-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 215 |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |