CT HB06542 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To preserve certain farmland located on the property of the Southbury Training School for the purpose of engaging in agriculture.
Title
An Act Concerning The Preservation Of Farmland At The Southbury Training School.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 399 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 144 AS AMENDED (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 144 AS AMENDED (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-03 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-03 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-01 | House | Public Act 13-90 |
2013-05-29 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-29 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-29 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2013-05-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-23 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-05-21 | House | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2013-05-13 | House | File Number 804 |
2013-05-13 | House | Senate Calendar Number 584 |
2013-05-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-09 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-09 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6759 |
2013-04-22 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-22 | House | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-19 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2013-04-11 | House | File Number 465 |
2013-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 301 |
2013-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |