CT HB06530 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To determine how to continue the development of renewable energy sources in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Development Of Connecticut-based Renewable Energy Sources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-02 | House | File Number 302 |
2013-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 212 |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |