CT HB06526 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Public Health to identify chemicals of high concern to children and to require manufacturers of children's products to provide notice to the commissioner if the manufacturer's product contains a chemical of high concern to children.
Title
An Act Concerning Children's Products And Chemicals Of High Concern.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-27 | House | File Number 228 |
2013-03-27 | House | House Calendar Number 171 |
2013-03-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |