CT HB06503 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To encourage the timely siting and applicable permitting of anaerobic digesters on farms while establishing workable feed stock requirements for such facilities.
Title
An Act Concerning The Siting Of Anaerobic Digestion Facilities On Farms And The Expanded Use And Establishment Of Certain Compost Facilities And Standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 231 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 45 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 46 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 45 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 46 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-05-26 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-05-26 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-05-25 | House | Public Act 21-16 |
2021-05-20 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-05-20 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-20 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-04-28 | House | File Number 625 |
2021-04-26 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2021-04-26 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7441 |
2021-04-20 | House | File Number 528 |
2021-04-20 | House | House Calendar Number 381 |
2021-04-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-12 | House | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |