CT HB06499 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide the state, through the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection, with authorization to seek greater oversight and responsibility from the Nuclear Regulatory Commission for certain radiation security concerning radioisotopes, uranium and thorium and quantities of special nuclear materials.
Title
An Act Concerning Radiation Security.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-04 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-03-30 | House | File Number 206 |
2021-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 177 |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |