CT HB06492 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To protect the confidentiality of state agency employees who provide information to the Auditors of Public Accounts regarding possible agency fraud.
Title
An Act Concerning The Confidentiality Of Employees Supplying Information To The Auditors Of Public Accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 610 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 123 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 123 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-27 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-27 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-20 | House | Public Act 13-292 |
2013-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-05-10 | House | Senate Calendar Number 571 |
2013-05-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-08 | House | House Passed |
2013-04-15 | House | File Number 506 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 323 |
2013-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |