CT HB06490 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-01 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-01 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the provision of certain services to persons diagnosed with autism spectrum disorder and establish a pilot program for such persons.
Title
An Act Establishing A Pilot Program For Persons Diagnosed With Autism Spectrum Disorder.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-04-15 | House | File Number 649 |
2015-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 408 |
2015-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-31 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-30 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2015-03-25 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-27 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2015-02-11 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |