CT HB06473 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - File Number 123
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To provide funding to the Diaper Bank of Connecticut so that it may provide feminine hygiene products to women of limited income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Expanding The Diaper Bank To Include Feminine Hygiene Products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24HouseFile Number 123
2021-03-24HouseHouse Calendar Number 122
2021-03-24HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2021-03-24HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/21 5:00 PM
2021-03-09HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-03-09HouseJoint Favorable
2021-02-19HousePublic Hearing 02/23
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback