CT HB06462 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To delay changes to provisions concerning use of force by a peace officer enacted as part of public act 20-1 of the July special session and to make certain other changes to said provisions.
Title
An Act Concerning Use Of Force By A Peace Officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 52 PASS (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 19 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 19 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Public Act 21-4 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 84 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | House Passed |
2021-03-11 | House | File Number 45 |
2021-03-11 | House | House Calendar Number 64 |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-18 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |