CT HB06458 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish an account for the purpose of operating the New England Disaster Training Center.
Title
An Act Concerning The New England Disaster Training Center Activity Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 421 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 149 (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 149 (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-03 | House | Public Act 13-113 |
2013-05-30 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Calendar Number 599 |
2013-05-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-16 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-05-14 | House | House Passed |
2013-05-08 | House | File Number 771 |
2013-05-08 | House | House Calendar Number 529 |
2013-05-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/07/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-13 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-03-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2013-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |