CT HB06445 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-02 - Public Hearing 04/06
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-02 - Public Hearing 04/06
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a deduction from the personal income tax for interest paid on student loans.
Title
An Act Concerning A Deduction From The Personal Income Tax For Student Loan Interest.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | Public Hearing 04/06 |
2015-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2015-03-05 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |