CT HB06423 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To protect the public health by ensuring adequate and appropriate immunizations of children.
Title
An Act Concerning Immunizations.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] | Rep. Geoffrey Luxenberg [D] | Rep. Stephen Meskers [D] |
Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] | Rep. Frank Smith [D] | Rep. Charlie Stallworth [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 92 (Y: 11 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 93 (Y: 10 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 94 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 95 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 96 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 30 HOUSE AMD F (Y: 51 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 31 HOUSE AMD G (Y: 135 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 32 AS AMENDED (Y: 90 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 24 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 106 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 25 MOTION TO REFER (Y: 57 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 26 AS AMENDED HOUSE AMD B (Y: 52 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 27 AS AMENDED HOUSE AMD C (Y: 54 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 28 HOUSE AMD D (Y: 49 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 29 HOUSE AMD E (Y: 52 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 93 (Y: 10 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 94 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 95 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 96 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 30 HOUSE AMD F (Y: 51 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 31 HOUSE AMD G (Y: 135 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 32 AS AMENDED (Y: 90 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 24 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 106 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 25 MOTION TO REFER (Y: 57 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 26 AS AMENDED HOUSE AMD B (Y: 52 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 27 AS AMENDED HOUSE AMD C (Y: 54 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 28 HOUSE AMD D (Y: 49 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 29 HOUSE AMD E (Y: 52 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-05-05 | House | Public Act 21-6 |
2021-04-28 | House | Signed by Governor in Original |
2021-04-27 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-04-27 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-04-27 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,G |
2021-04-27 | House | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 7543 |
2021-04-27 | House | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 7426 |
2021-04-27 | House | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7375 |
2021-04-27 | House | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 7542 |
2021-04-27 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,G |
2021-04-20 | House | Senate Calendar Number 320 |
2021-04-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,G |
2021-04-19 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule G 7009 |
2021-04-19 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule F 7091 |
2021-04-19 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule E 7008 |
2021-04-19 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 6985 |
2021-04-19 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 7003 |
2021-04-19 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 6981 |
2021-04-19 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7076 |
2021-04-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-14 | House | File Number 431 |
2021-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 323 |
2021-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 5:00 PM |
2021-04-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |