CT HB06401 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - File Number 129
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - File Number 129
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify the state's authority to regulate interconnected voice over Internet protocol service.
Title
An Act Concerning Interconnected Voice Over Internet Protocol Service And Internet Protocol-enabled Service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | File Number 129 |
2013-03-25 | House | House Calendar Number 111 |
2013-03-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |