CT HB06397 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require employers that pay for employees' workers' compensation medical claims to submit such claims to the all-payer claims database.
Title
An Act Expanding The Definition Of A Reporting Entity To The All-payer Claims Database.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | No Action |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2021-03-29 | House | File Number 153 |
2021-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 142 |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |