CT HB06394 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide sufficient state reimbursement for the reasonable cost of providing meals to elderly persons and to increase the number of elderly persons who may be served in the elderly nutrition program.
Title
An Act Increasing Funding For Elderly Nutrition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-19 | House | File Number 111 |
2015-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 87 |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-01-30 | House | Public Hearing 02/05 |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |