CT HB06386 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-15 - File Number 504
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-15 - File Number 504
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require a study of the effectiveness of requiring state Medicaid to pay the cost of institution-sponsored health insurance premiums and provide supplemental coverage to medically indigent students enrolled in a constituent unit.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Medicaid Funds To Pay Health Insurance Costs For Medically Indigent Students.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Sen. James Maroney [D] | Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | File Number 504 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 321 |
2013-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |