CT HB06385 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Motion Failed JFS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Motion Failed JFS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit the use of pesticides at public and private schools.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Use Of Pesticides At Public Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | House | Motion Failed JFS |
2013-05-31 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Environment |
2013-04-02 | House | File Number 293 |
2013-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 203 |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |