CT HB06380 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To (1) require personal and commercial risk insurance policies to provide, for a covered loss that requires repair or replacement of damaged items, parts, components or materials, for the repair or replacement of adjacent undamaged items, parts, components or materials to achieve uniformity as to composition, color, texture, size or quality, (2) regulate the declination, cancellation, nonrenewal of and premium increases for homeowners insurance policies, and (3) specify that a home improvement contractor shall not engage in the activities of a public adjuster.
Title
An Act Concerning Property And Casualty Insurance Policies And Public Adjuster Contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 451 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 94 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 94 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-05 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-04 | House | Public Act 13-138 |
2013-05-31 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-06 | House | File Number 754 |
2013-05-06 | House | Senate Calendar Number 524 |
2013-05-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6221 |
2013-04-02 | House | File Number 290 |
2013-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 200 |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2013-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |