CT HB06378 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Referred by House to Committee on Housing
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Referred by House to Committee on Housing
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To give preference to veterans when applying for housing assistance if they meet certain federal criteria.
Title
An Act Providing Veterans' Preferences In The Rental Assistance Program And Housing Authority Projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Housing |
2015-03-19 | House | File Number 106 |
2015-03-19 | House | House Calendar Number 82 |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2015-03-04 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-13 | House | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-03 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |