CT HB06376 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To redefine "peace officer" to include a motor vehicle inspector who is certified as a police officer and make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Motor Vehicle Inspectors As Peace Officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 427 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 251 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-20SenatePublic Act 19-108
2019-06-05SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-31SenateFile Number 1021
2019-05-31SenateSenate Calendar Number 657
2019-05-31SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-30SenateImmediate Transmittal to the Senate
2019-05-30HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-30HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8055
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 401
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 253
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-21HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
2019-02-26HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback