CT HB06355 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-4)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-4)
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Homeowner Protection Rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 465 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 274 AS AMENDED (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 274 AS AMENDED (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-06 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-05 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-04 | House | Public Act 13-136 |
2013-05-31 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-27 | House | File Number 862 |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Calendar Number 665 |
2013-05-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-23 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-23 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7552 |
2013-05-07 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-07 | House | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-06 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-04-24 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-24 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-24 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | File Number 286 |
2013-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 196 |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2013-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2013-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |