CT HB06354 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Public Hearing 02/22
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Public Hearing 02/22
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the resiliency of hardened structures below the high-tide line in severe weather conditions.
Title
An Act Authorizing Hardened Structures Below The High-tide Line For Living Shoreline Purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-27 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2017-02-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-01-27 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |