CT HB06346 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make various technical changes and minor revisions to the statutes involving the Department of Children and Families.
Title
An Act Revising Various Statutes Concerning The Department Of Children And Families.
Sponsors
House Children Committee | Rep. Bruce Morris [D] | Rep. Michelle Cook [D] | Sen. Dante Bartolomeo [D] |
Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Sen. Toni Harp [D] | Sen. Eric Coleman [D] | Rep. Thomas Vicino [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 330 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 119 AS AMENDED (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 119 AS AMENDED (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-20 | House | Public Act 13-40 |
2013-05-16 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-16 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-10 | House | File Number 790 |
2013-05-10 | House | Senate Calendar Number 565 |
2013-05-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-08 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-08 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6591 |
2013-04-17 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-17 | House | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2013-04-12 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-12 | House | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-05 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Human Services |
2013-03-25 | House | File Number 123 |
2013-03-25 | House | House Calendar Number 105 |
2013-03-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-07 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |