CT HB06322 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical, conforming and minor changes to the insurance and related statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Legislative Commissioners' Recommendations For Technical And Minor Changes To The Insurance And Related Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 445 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 27 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 27 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-05 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-04 | House | Public Act 13-134 |
2013-05-31 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2013-05-31 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-04-11 | House | Senate Calendar Number 346 |
2013-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-10 | House | House Passed |
2013-02-27 | House | File Number 16 |
2013-02-27 | House | House Calendar Number 41 |
2013-02-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-02-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/26/13 5:00 PM |
2013-02-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/05 |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |