CT HB06311 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-9-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-9-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit municipalities from adopting breed-specific dog ordinances.
Title
An Act Prohibiting Municipalities From Adopting Breed-specific Dog Ordinances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 432 PASS (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 108 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 108 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-04 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-03 | House | Public Act 13-103 |
2013-05-30 | House | In Concurrence |
2013-05-30 | House | Senate Passed |
2013-05-09 | House | Senate Calendar Number 556 |
2013-05-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-07 | House | House Passed |
2013-04-18 | House | File Number 572 |
2013-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 358 |
2013-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-02 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-01 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-03-22 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2013-02-13 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |