CT HB06305 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-15 - File Number 502
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-15 - File Number 502
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the Commissioner of Energy and Environmental Protection to amend hunting regulations for certain localities where such hunting poses an unreasonable risk to the animals in a wildlife sanctuary.
Title
An Act Prohibiting Hunting In Proximity To Wildlife Preserves.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | File Number 502 |
2013-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 319 |
2013-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2013-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-15 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |